THE FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 21 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 24 October 2016 On time Download