THE FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £32.08m £68.40m £58.59m £60.18m £73.41m
Total expenditure £45.59m £20.02m £53.72m £68.22m £60.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £18.56m £0 N/A £18.04m
Income - Donations and legacies £31.17m £67.28m £57.42m £58.32m £71.46m
Income - Other trading activities £778.64k £571.00k £595.00k £538.00k £166.96k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £137.91k £61.00k £106.00k £908.00k £1.15m
Income - Other £0 £484.00k £460.00k £416.00k £630.89k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £44.99m £19.68m £53.33m £67.85m £60.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £602.71k £0 £389.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £217.75k £355.00k £434.00k £0 £551.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £52.89m £0 £53.28m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £337.00k £0 £372.00k £0