BBC MEDIA ACTION

Charity number: 1076235
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)