BBC MEDIA ACTION

Charity number: 1076235
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £784.59k £670.99k £3.08m
Income from government grants £18.78m £20.53m £8.55m £7.70m £7.88m
Other income £26.50m £23.62m £26.06m £29.31m £29.85m
Total expenditure £43.95m £43.76m £35.93m £38.65m £41.71m