Accounts and annual returns CLARA E BURGESS CHARITY

Charity number: 1072546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2022 04 August 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2022 04 August 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 October 2021 01 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2021 01 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 October 2020 02 September 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 02 September 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 October 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2018 14 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window