Financial history CLARA E BURGESS CHARITY

Charity number: 1072546
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/10/2017 20/10/2018 20/10/2019 20/10/2020 20/10/2021
Total gross income £374.29k £358.88k £339.41k £358.33k £237.17k
Total expenditure £551.33k £387.50k £456.09k £458.90k £191.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A