Financial history UK JEWISH FILM LTD

Charity number: 1072914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £274.48k £369.18k £288.66k £361.90k £301.31k
Total expenditure £397.71k £338.44k £293.45k £365.06k £277.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A