Trustees UK JEWISH FILM LTD

Charity number: 1072914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN LEWIS Chair 17 May 2013
None on record
Robert Samuelson Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Jane Barclay Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Christophe Mercier Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Claudia Emma Rosencrantz Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Anthony David Pins Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Jeffrey Nigel Gruder Trustee 20 February 2018
None on record
Anne Joseph Trustee 20 February 2018
None on record
Michael Etherton Trustee 10 December 2015
MOSAIC VOICES
Recently registered
JUDY IRONSIDE Trustee 10 December 2015
None on record