CAMDEN CITY ISLINGTON AND WESTMINSTER BEREAVEMENT SERVICE

Charity number: 1071144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 February 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 November 2016 On time Download