Financial history THE LEPROSY MISSION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.78m £14.03m £14.43m £14.79m £17.35m
Total expenditure £14.58m £14.35m £15.51m £14.72m £16.98m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.79m £12.16m £12.49m £12.27m £14.79m
Income - Other trading activities £1.52m £1.57m £1.75m £2.15m £2.16m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £142.12k £123.16k £137.11k £112.58k £102.97k
Income - Other £323.39k £184.26k £46.42k £263.85k £285.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.43m £10.75m £13.16m £12.20m £14.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.99m £2.18m £648.49k £601.11k £2.70m
Expenditure - Governance £78.33k £83.11k £85.25k £64.76k £60.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £11.77m £11.14m £13.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £30.50k £18.00k £23.69k £22.62k £26.16k
Expenditure - Other £1.16m £1.42m £1.70m £1.92m £0