Trustees THE LEPROSY MISSION INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1076356

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Osborne | Chair |
|
||||||
Professor Ekanem Ikpi Braide | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bhal Chakranarayan | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lea Fernandes | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hla Hla Caroline Aye | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Martin | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVID GRAY | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr WARWICK JOHN BRITTON | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE RATLIFF | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PUTMAN | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EMANS | Trustee | 14 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.