Financial history CHILDREN'S LINKS

Charity number: 1071058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.71m £2.26m £1.73m £1.48m £2.22m
Total expenditure £1.78m £2.16m £1.78m £1.45m £2.07m
Income from government contracts £832.31k £33.50k £35.00k £355.00k £965.04k
Income from government grants £248.00k £76.00k £537.29k £63.00k £71.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £11.00k £7.00k £2.00k £4.00k
Income - Other trading activities £18.00k £724.00k £499.00k £252.00k £192.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.52m £1.22m £1.11m £2.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £123.00k £15.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £2.16m £1.28m £1.20m £1.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.64k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.00k £11.00k £0 £10.00k £10.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £44.31k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £498.00k £248.00k £177.00k