Trustees CHILDREN'S LINKS

Charity number: 1071058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Elizabeth Buik Chair 27 July 2021
HORNCASTLE CRISIS SUPPORT TEAM
Received: On time
Jessica Mary Brown Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Victoria Ann Lofthouse Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Dr Jonathan Mark Wainwright Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Dr Katie Ruane Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
THOMASIN NICHOLDS Trustee 28 October 2017
None on record
Alistair John Wright Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record
RACHEL CROFT Trustee 15 January 2013
None on record