BLACKMOOR PARK INFANT HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising activities for Infant School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 18 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Mark Ross | Chair | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hitchmough | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Blackmoor Park Infant School | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91k | £5.76k | £4.32k | £2.23k | £5.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £583 | £79 | £72 | £119 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKMOOR PARK INFANT SCHOOL
LEYFIELD ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L12 9EY
- Phone:
- 01512288576
- Email:
- office@bpinfant.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window