LATIN AMERICAN MINING MONITORING PROGRAMME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in mining, the activities of national and transnational companies involved in mining, and the impact of mining on biodiversity, ecosystems and indigenous peoples in Latin America and in other regions where they are of significance to Latin America.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Argentina
- Bolivia
- Chile
- Costa Rica
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- Mexico
- Peru
- Venezuela
Governance
- 19 May 2000: Standard registration
- 01 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LAMMP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.75k | £153.18k | £205.53k | £26.96k | £44.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.50k | £78.98k | £142.28k | £104.93k | £139.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MINING, THE ACTIVITIES OF NATIONAL AND MULTINATIONAL COMPANIES INVOLVED IN MINING, AND THE IMPACT OF MINING ON BIODIVERSITY, ECOSYSTEMS AND INDIGENOUS PEOPLES IN LATIN AMERICA AND IN OTHER REGIONS WHERE THEY ARE OF SIGNIFICANCE TO LATIN AMERICA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE, CENTRAL AND SOUTH AMERICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window