Trustees THE ROUNDHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1071487
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Eric Hugh Turner Chair 09 February 2017
IMPETUS - THE PRIVATE EQUITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE INFLEXION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jackie Freeman Trustee 08 May 2019
AGE UK
Received: On time
Nadja BELLAN-WHITE Trustee 29 November 2018
None on record
Jonathan Badyal Trustee 30 November 2017
THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Adedoyin Olayiwola Adepitan MBE Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
Sanjeev Bhaskar Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
Pauline Ann Tambling CBE Trustee 21 July 2016
THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST
Received: On time
FASHION RETAIL ACADEMY
Received: On time
Sally Wood Trustee 30 June 2015
None on record
Johnson Etienne Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record
Ella BENNETT Trustee 18 July 2013
None on record
NICHOLAS DAVID ALLOTT OBE Trustee
THEATRE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MACKINTOSH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SOHO THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Caspar Joe NORMAN Trustee
THE NORMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORMAN TRUST
Recently registered
MARCUS JOHN DAVEY CBE Trustee
THE BROOK STREET BAND TRUST
Received: On time