Financial history DEVON ARTS IN SCHOOLS INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1071762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £251.57k £212.78k £298.63k £302.77k £336.20k
Total expenditure £279.58k £251.46k £306.78k £275.45k £234.05k
Income from government contracts £5.83k £2.50k £35.00k £23.00k £19.71k
Income from government grants £34.19k £32.00k £15.00k £15.00k N/A