Accounts and annual returns BUILDING FUTURES IN MALAWI

Charity number: 1075709
Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 694 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 694 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 March 2019 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required