Financial history BUILDING FUTURES IN MALAWI

Charity number: 1075709
Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.54k £6.24k £15.37k £21.36k £24.57k
Total expenditure £9.12k £5.94k £15.03k £21.25k £24.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A