Financial history NORTHERN ACADEMY OF PERFORMING ARTS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1076867
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £490.57k £1.12m £502.29k £334.39k £602.31k
Total expenditure £488.40k £541.23k £567.52k £454.64k £469.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £100.61k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £622.74k £6.23k N/A £334.47k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £73.44k £84.80k N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £423.62k £409.85k N/A £264.56k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £240 £395 N/A £178
Income - Other N/A £1.21k £1.02k N/A £3.10k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £518.95k £545.47k N/A £466.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £22.28k £22.05k N/A £2.81k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.25k £3.92k N/A £5.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0