R.A.F BOSCOMBE DOWN EARLY YEARS LEARNING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pre school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 October 1998: Standard registration
- 19 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- R.A.F BOSCOMBE DOWN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.32k | £36.63k | £35.72k | £39.44k | £40.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.78k | £34.51k | £34.76k | £36.43k | £36.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 18 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 05 August 2009 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 05 August 2009 | 6 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 23 December 2008 | 146 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 10 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 20 June 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HAPPY, SECURE AND CARING ATMOSPHERE IN WHICH 3-5 YEAR OLD CHILDREN CAN LEARN THROUGH STRUCTURED PLAY AND EXPERIENCES. THE PLAYGROUP IS ESTABLISHED PRIMARILY TO CATER FOR THE NEEDS OF THE CHILDREN OF SERVICE PERSONNEL PARENTED BY THE RAF SUPPORT UNIT (RAFSU) BOSCOMBE DOWN.
Area of benefit
BOSCOMBE DOWN, WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window