ST JAMES' MEMORIAL PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1073962
Charity reporting is overdue by 795 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Annual return 09 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 429 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 429 days
Annual return 09 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 795 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 795 days
Annual return 09 May 2017 06 April 2021 1124 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 09 May 2016 05 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2016 Not Required