Financial history DIRECT HELP & ADVICE LTD.

Charity number: 1073231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.20m £1.49m £1.53m £1.55m £1.31m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.45m £1.44m £1.18m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £611.85k £733.33k £984.18k £570.98k £734.39k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £207.60k £18.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.21k £52.57k £32.37k £226.01k £17.90k
Income - Other trading activities £36.64k £41.52k £49.33k £43.95k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.39m £1.44m £1.28m £1.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6 £8 £3 £27 £41.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.45m £1.44m £1.18m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66 £149 £128 £452 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.55k £4.65k £5.64k £5.30k £5.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0