DIRECT HELP & ADVICE LTD.

Charity number: 1073231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Bravery Chair 14 July 2020 None on record
JEAN SEAMAN Trustee None on record
ALAN CARTWRIGHT Trustee None on record
Nicholas John Williams Trustee 15 July 2021 None on record
Kevin McGrath Trustee 25 May 2021 None on record
Andrew William Deighton Trustee 12 January 2016 None on record
Paul Steven Davies Trustee 18 March 2019 None on record