THE S. MARY AND S. ANNE ABBOTS BROMLEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1073252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 May 2020 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 March 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required