Financial history TRAFFIC INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £9.16m £13.51m £9.39m £10.12m £11.36m
Total expenditure £10.26m £10.47m £9.57m £9.55m £10.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £652.99k £248.77k £821.55k £572.19k £554.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.36m £1.38m £1.18m £1.16m £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.79m £9.69m £8.18m £8.95m £10.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.22k £21.85k £271 £1.82k £294
Income - Other £670 £2.42m £23.02k £6.32k £8.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.06m £10.31m £9.32m £9.29m £10.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £198.24k £155.71k £248.22k £264.84k £220.66k
Expenditure - Governance £171.33k £180.49k £201.64k £217.20k £249.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.63m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0