THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY LEEDS BRANCH

Charity number: 1072452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £50.18k £57.13k £66.82k £49.21k £47.56k
Total expenditure £49.96k £56.54k £62.11k £51.33k £45.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A