LEOMINSTER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
70 voice SATB choral society based in Leominster, Herefordshire under the musical direction of James Atherton. Rehearsals weekly in the Methodist Church, Green Lane, Leominster - Tuesdays at 1930. Two major concerts annually, plus Carols by Candlelight - generally all held in Leominster's ancient Priory Church. New members always welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 05 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Markwick | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE THURSBY KENWARD | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
neil spence ramsay | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Caroline Prior | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Moore | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Mee | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.24k | £1.68k | £12.86k | £17.95k | £13.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.52k | £0 | £11.18k | £9.85k | £13.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN LEOMINSTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITMORE CROSS
TILLINGTON
HEREFORD
HR4 8LE
- Phone:
- 01432761500
- Email:
- hjm@hjmaccountsltd.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window