AMANNAGWU COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 1073873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.30k £800 £1.26k £1.39k £1.20k
Total expenditure £1.32k £410 £250 £1.70k £1.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A