Trustees THE BORN FREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1070906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL REYNER Chair
BEACONSFIELD EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Sue-Anne Biggs Trustee 14 December 2022
None on record
Arabella Lack Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Dr Amal-Lee Amin Trustee 15 June 2022
BULB FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Navindu Katugampola Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Jess Ruben Trustee 10 June 2020
None on record
Sean Daniel Cassidy Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Sharon Peake Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Kate Stephenson Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
JENNY SEAGROVE Trustee 28 November 2011
MANE CHANCE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
MICHAEL DRAKE Trustee
None on record
VIRGINIA MCKENNA Trustee
None on record