NORTH TYNESIDE DISTRICT DISABILITY FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENABLE DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES TO COME TOGETHER INFORMALLY TO MUTUAL BENEFIT TO CONSULT AND SHARE INFORMATION ACROSS A RANGE OF PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES ACROSS HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE, LEISURE AND LEARNING, ENTERPRISE AND OPPORTUNTITY, SPORTS, ARTS, CULTURE.. in order to improve and enhance the quality of life of disabled people and their representtives an the N Tyneside area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 17 November 1998: Standard registration
- 11 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1182346 NORTH TYNESIDE DISABILITY FORUM LTD
- NORTH TYNESIDE DISABILITY FORUM NTDF (Working name)
- NTDF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £486.96k | £447.28k | £476.45k | £455.79k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £464.12k | £432.99k | £452.09k | £427.86k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 02 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 23 August 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 1998 AND 30 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE DDF IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED PEOPLE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE DISABLED AND THEIR CARERS, PRINCIPALLY WITHIN NORTH TYNESIDE AND PRIMARILY TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF A FORUM TO DISCUSS AND RESPOND TO ISSUES OF INTEREST AND CONCERN TO THE DISABLED COMMUNITYY
Area of benefit
NORTH TYNESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window