FLASH LEY C.P. SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1072053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 524 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required