Trustees ST CATHERINE'S SCHOOL BRAMLEY
Charity number: 1070858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW PETER LOWE MBE | Chair | 23 June 2018 |
|
|||||
BISHOP RICHARD PAUL DAVIES | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|||||
STUART HAWKES | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Margaret Povey | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Lynn Narraway | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Hounsell | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Good | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Blauth MCMI MRAeS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denis Brian Ulyet | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Pianca | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ALBERT DOMINGO RELOJ ALONZO | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Farrell | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR FINBARR COTTER FRCP, PhD | Trustee | 07 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE CROUCH LLB | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANET FILMER MCGOWAN MB BS FRCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN CHARLES MORLEY TIPPETT FCA TEP | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN SHIPWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE SLADE JOHNSTONE MD FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.