AFRICAN CARIBBEAN FORUM

Charity number: 1072021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 January 2018 On time Download