Accounts and annual returns NELSON ASIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1071553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 January 2022 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required