WEST LONDON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1074971
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £104.22k £165.53k £131.12k £114.68k £147.46k
Total expenditure £88.56k £133.69k £140.00k £154.59k £125.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A