THE INTERNATIONAL CONTINENCE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1074929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Philip Van Kerrebroeck Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Prof Enrico Finazzi Agro Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Dr Manjula Annappa Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Dr David Castro Diaz Chair 15 October 2013 None on record
Dr Lori Birder Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Dr John Heesakkers Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
MARCUS DRAKE Trustee 14 September 2017 None on record
Prof Cristina Naranjo Ortiz Trustee 08 October 2015 None on record