Financial history ST MARY-LE-BOW YOUNG HOMELESS PROJECT

Charity number: 1103578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £71.90k £97.84k £104.59k £107.86k £132.32k
Total expenditure £88.55k £98.43k £94.83k £98.79k £104.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A