ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION ALRESFORD BRANCH

Charity number: 1071073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Alresford and District branch of the Royal Air Force Association meets every month to conduct its business with the primary purpose of providing support to ex RAF members and their families. We do this by raising funds via donations for the Wings Appeal charity and via our welfare fund, to support members who are ill, or in need of assistance, especially any war injured and their dependants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £4,058
Total expenditure: £4,110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Trevelyan Chair 07 March 2024
None on record
Pascal Zgambo Trustee 06 March 2025
None on record
LINDA TREVELYAN Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Julie James Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Derek Sweetenham Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.29k £2.50k £2.22k £3.48k £4.06k
Total expenditure £1.81k £2.62k £209 £4.07k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cranford
Station Approach
Four Marks
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 5HH
Phone:
07920772781
Website:

No information available