THE BRITISH ALBANIAN KOSOVAR COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 1072694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.52k £9.68k £65.50k £59.07k £84.43k
Total expenditure £46.94k £18.87k £66.85k £58.59k £75.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A