THE DIANA PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071461
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

See Area of Operation entry

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020

Total income: £22,543
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Lipson Trustee 11 March 2016 None on record
DIANA CLARE PARKER Trustee None on record
GILLIAN FRANCES DORAN Trustee None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £15.21k £15.11k £22.50k £18.77k £22.54k
Total expenditure £16.00k £16.25k £17.00k £15.75k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 June 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 December 2020 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 December 2020 681 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 July 2018 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 25 October 2017 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
WITHERS LLP
20 OLD BAILEY
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
Phone:
02075976000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available