EDINGTON SCHOOL ROOM

Charity number: 1098952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 November 2020 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required