EDINGTON SCHOOL ROOM

Charity number: 1098952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.95k £2.06k £2.25k £1.96k £1.02k
Total expenditure £2.15k £1.88k £2.31k £2.59k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A