Trustees THE DURHAM PALESTINE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 1085097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JUSTIN WILLIS | Chair | 30 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Martin Wood | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL GRIFFIN | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fadia Faqir | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARROP | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Reeve | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MALCOLM | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Badreshany | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Eileen Williamson | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Wilson | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr NATHAN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIN MCINTYRE | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
DIANE WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR BILL WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.