THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S

Charity number: 1073162
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 January 2021 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)