THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S

Charity number: 1073162
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Other income £6.66k £6.60k £15.16k £8.93k £8.03k
Total expenditure £2.62k £1.42k £15.72k £1.15k £344