Accounts and annual returns EMIH LIMITED

Charity number: 1073254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 03 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 03 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 05 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 27 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 27 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window