Trustees EMIH LIMITED
Charity number: 1073254

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WILLIAM GEMMELL OBE | Chair | 06 March 1998 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Tarbotton | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Councillor Rhys Furley | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Lesley Julia Morrell | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan William Kirkman | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Sue Lockwood | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN ALAN PARKES CBE | Trustee | 19 October 2007 |
|
|
||||||||
TREVOR SAMUEL ERIC BOANAS | Trustee | 10 September 2004 |
|
|||||||||
Prof. Graham Chesters | Trustee | 06 March 1998 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.