Financial history THE WHARFEDALE VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1071353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £303.22k £597.05k £465.00k £459.17k £476.84k
Total expenditure £344.68k £341.47k £438.43k £471.29k £445.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £584.54k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £11.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £798 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £239.19k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £102.28k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £16.38k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A