Trustees THE WHARFEDALE VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1071353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID STEPHEN FLOWERS Chair
THE MALACHI TRUST
Received: On time
Judith Mary Ann Hardy Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Griselda Togobo Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
William Sims Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Dr Michael Byde Trustee 24 September 2018
THE UNIVERSITIES' CHAPLAINCY IN LEEDS TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Steere Trustee 13 March 2017
None on record
Jonathan Grayson Trustee 12 February 2016
None on record